+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House for further action
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate for further action
- Point of order sustained
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed