+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (161)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Redistricting, Select
- Read first time
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amended
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Vote reconsidered
- Amended
- Amended
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
- Rules suspended
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Committee report distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Redistricting
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor