+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (76)
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed