+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor