+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor