+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to State Affairs
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed