+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor