+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Left pending in committee
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor