+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/15
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed