+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/12/2021
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/24/2021
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor