+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed