+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Davis, Sarah
Type:
Primary Sponsor