+ − Actions (27)
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Filed