+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order sustained
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor