+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment tabled
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Filed