+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Left pending in committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/14/2021
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor