+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor