+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor