+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/21/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor