+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/8/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/7/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed