+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/7/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor