+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor