+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Calendars Committee
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor