+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor