+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed