+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (64)
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/15/2019
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor