+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed