+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/17/2021
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor