+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Justice
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Bonnen, Dennis
Type:
Primary Sponsor