+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/23/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor