+ − Actions (91)
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 2nd time
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Point of order overruled
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Postponed
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Recalled from subcommittee
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Left pending in subcommittee
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred to subcommittee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Filed