+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Motion withdrawn
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor