+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Correction in referral
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor