+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Vote reconsidered
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Miller, Rick
Type:
Primary Sponsor