+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Filed