+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed