+ − Actions (30)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor