+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (84)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Rereferred to committee
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor