+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor