+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Turner, Sylvester
Type:
Primary Sponsor