+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor