+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor