+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor