+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor