+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor