+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/18/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/17/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed