+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor