+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor