+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor