+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
- Corrected comm. report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed